McNeil, Bernadette (CPSO#: 68922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
4th Floor
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernadette McNeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McNeil ( CPSO# 68922 )

Business Address:
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
4th Floor
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 756-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNADETTE MCNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Sep 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003