McNeil, Gordon Francis (CPSO#: 67080)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1999