McNeill, Michelle Margaret (CPSO#: 65090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 7010
1680 Oxford St E
London ON  N5Y 5R8
Phone: (519) 455-9000 Ext. 2451
Fax: (519) 455-8064
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARGARET MCNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 11 Aug 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 11 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 12 Feb 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993