McNiece, Lynne Carole (CPSO#: 27906)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2016