McPhail, Monica Indira Margaret (CPSO#: 61474)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 2001