McPherson, Isla Louise (CPSO#: 84529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone: (519) 824-6000
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISLA LOUISE MCPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010