Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McPherson, Phyllis Ruth (CPSO#: 54082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: McPherson-Kay, Phyllis Ruth (used until: 02 Jul 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H4203
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7341
Fax: (613) 696-7130
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth McPherson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McPherson ( CPSO# 54082 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H-4203
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5256

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHYLLIS RUTH MCPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985