McQueen, Jodi Lee (CPSO#: 82620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Phillips, Jodi Lee (used until: 28 Jul 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brant Community Health Care System
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jodi McQueen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McQueen ( CPSO# 82620 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
Willett Hospital
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODI LEE MCQUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCQUEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007