McReelis, Kylen Darby (CPSO#: 75147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6879
Fax: (705) 740-6863
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Hospital Eye Clinic
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4762
Fax: (416) 480-4481
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. D. McReelis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McReelis ( CPSO# 75147 )
Dr. J. Lovshin ( CPSO# 82946 )

Business Address:
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6879

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLEN DARBY MCREELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCREELIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005