McRitchie, Donna Isabelle (CPSO#: 55725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite #102
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6906
Fax: (416) 756-6909
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna McRitchie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McRitchie ( CPSO# 55725 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 102
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6906

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA ISABELLE MCRITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCRITCHIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987