McSweeney, Sean Edward (CPSO#: 89640)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011