McTavish, Wyatt Ross (CPSO#: 94541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-2604
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wyatt McTavish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McTavish ( CPSO# 94541 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WYATT ROSS MCTAVISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCTAVISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012