McTurk, Bruce Eric (CPSO#: 55348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
234 Cook Street
Barrie ON  L4M 4H5
Phone: (705) 728-7135
Fax: (705) 728-3770
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Coleman Care Centre
140 Cundles Road West
Barrie ON  L9N 9X8
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE ERIC MCTURK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCTURK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988