McWhirter, Elaine (CPSO#: 73937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juavinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64603
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE MCWHIRTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCWHIRTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003