Mcmurrich, James Hamilton Roy (CPSO#: 100759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: 519-623-2546
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mcmurrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mcmurrich ( CPSO# 100759)

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HAMILTON ROY MCMURRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMURRICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015