Meade, Maureen Ora (CPSO#: 62651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 23162
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Meade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meade ( CPSO# 62651 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Suite 2C10
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-9140

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Suite 412 M
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUREEN ORA MEADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEADE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991