Meadley, Alexander Edward (CPSO#: 98711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 Colborne St. W.
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z6
Phone: (705) 325-1120
Fax: (705)325-1185
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. E. Meadley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meadley ( CPSO# 98711 )

Business Address:
216 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z6
Phone Number: (705) 325-1120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER EDWARD MEADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEADLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016