Mears, Paul Alan (CPSO#: 80737)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jun 2004 to 23 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2010