Mecci, Shahid Ulla (CPSO#: 22145)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Mecci has advised the College that his records will be stored with: Sudbury Cardiac Laboratory 208 Caswell Drive Sudbury, ON P3E 2N8
Date Received: 06 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012