Mech, Zdislaw Romuald (CPSO#: 15813)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 10 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective September 15, 2015, Dr. Mech has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.