Mechefske, Laura Rose (CPSO#: 103584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Base Kingston
33 Health Services
26 Somme Avenue
Building ME40 PO Box 17000
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 3232
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ROSE MECHEFSKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MECHEFSKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017