Mederski, Barbara Donna (CPSO#: 33720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1982

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Infectious Diseases Clinic
Leslie Medical Centre
409 - 4800 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 486-1519
Fax: (416) 486-8237
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bridgepoint Health Centre
14 St Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA DONNA MEDERSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDERSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1982

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Mar 1991
Summary:

 In March 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Mederski guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that she engaged in conduct or 
 an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Mederski be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register, and that she be fined $5000.00.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 28 Mar 1991