Medina, Carlos (CPSO#: 33023)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004