Medline, Norton Millard (CPSO#: 17893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1961

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1961

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone: 905 790 3000
Fax: 905 790 9659
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Medline Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Medline ( CPSO# 17893 )

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 09 Apr 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORTON MILLARD MEDLINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDLINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961