Mednick, Zale David (CPSO#: 97721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZALE DAVID MEDNICK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MEDNICK is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MEDNICK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MEDNICK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MEDNICK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MEDNICK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MEDNICK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017