Meek, Murray Dean (CPSO#: 79444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northwood Medical Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard, Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Canada
Phone: (705) 560-2227
Fax: (705) 521-0729
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Meek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meek ( CPSO# 79444 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY DEAN MEEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005