Meeuwisse, Willem Henry (CPSO#: 58181)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1990