Mehdar, Albayda Mustafa H (CPSO#: 99936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Postgraduate Medical Education
Western University
1151 Richmond St North
Room M103 Medical Sciences Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196612019
Fax: 5198502492
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBAYDA MUSTAFA H MEHDAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MEHDAR is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. MEHDAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MEHDAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MEHDAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MEHDAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MEHDAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 04 May 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2016 to 05 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018