Mehdian, Hossein (CPSO#: 73227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Tehran, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 SHEPPARD AVE E.
SUITE 226
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 850-4064
Fax: (416) 850-6681
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NORTH YORK GENERAL HOSPITAL
DIVISION OF ORTHOPAEDIC SURGERY
4001 LESLIE ST
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 850-4064
Fax: (416) 850-6681
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hossein Mehdian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mehdian ( CPSO# 73227 )

Business Address:
Suite 226
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 850-4064

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOSSEIN MEHDIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007