Mehin, Ramin (CPSO#: 70578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2004