Mehra, Akshay (CPSO#: 99222)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Agra University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012