Mehra, Sunil (CPSO#: 51186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Bhopal University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
14 Lisa St
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Phone: (647) 716-1687
Fax: (905) 454-7955
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehra ( CPSO# 51186 )

Business Address:
150 West Drive
Suite 100
Brampton ON  L6T 4P9
Phone Number: (647) 716-1687

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL MEHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1985