Mehrabian, Pezhman (CPSO#: 111117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  24 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rothbart Centre for Pain Care
4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Pain Clinic, TPC
Unit C8
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pezhman Mehrabian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mehrabian ( CPSO# 111117)

Business Address:
The Pain Clinic, TPC
C8
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 398-1515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pain Medicine Effective: 25 Oct 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Pezhman  Mehrabian  may practise pain medicine with The Pain Clinic,
                  TPC in North York, Ontario, and Rothbart Centre for Pain Care in Toronto,
                  Ontario, while under supervision  coordinated  by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on April 24, 2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Mehrabian's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide  the  required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Mehrabian's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the  College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Mehrabian's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  October 25, 2016, and will expire on or
                  before April 24, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.