Mehrmanesh, Zahra Flora (CPSO#: 25807)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Dalhousie University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Flora Mehrmanesh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 111 St Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6. (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 09 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016