Mehta, Amit Labhshanker (CPSO#: 62271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 684-6990
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.L. Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mehta ( CPSO# 62271 )

Business Address:
St. Catherine's General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT LABHSHANKER MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991