Mehta, Avni Bharat (CPSO#: 102041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orchid Medical Centre
6212 Main Street
Suite 202
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone: 905-591-4969
Fax: 877-595-1865
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avni Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mehta ( CPSO# 102041)

Business Address:
Suite 202
6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L2A 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 591-4969

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVNI BHARAT MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015