Mehta, Bella (CPSO#: 66750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bella Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mehta ( CPSO# 66750 )

Business Address:
3635 Rivergate Way
Suite 5
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone Number: (613) 739-5382

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BELLA MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1995