Mehta, Dinshaw Manchershaw (CPSO#: 21171)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nagpur University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006