Mehta, Kevan Dilip (CPSO#: 96288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: 416-813-6246
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mehta ( CPSO# 33042 )
Dr. K. Mehta ( CPSO# 96288 )
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 106517)

Business Address:
G131 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6759

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVAN DILIP MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016