Mehta, Mahendra Hiralal (CPSO#: 27841)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Leeds, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahendra H. Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 9 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 304 4002 Sheppard Avenue East Scarborough, ON M1S 1S1
Date Received: 15 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014