Mehta, Maria Zildany Pinheiro (CPSO#: 94410)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 11 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 12 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011