Mehta, Mauli Chiragbhai (CPSO#: 101151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  29 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Assessment Clinic
3560 Bathurst St
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAULI CHIRAGBHAI MEHTA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MEHTA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MEHTA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MEHTA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MEHTA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MEHTA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MEHTA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 29 May 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 May 2019