Mehta, Mitesh (CPSO#: 63877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6212 Main Street
Suite 201
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L3P 2Y2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mitesh Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mehta ( CPSO# 63877 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
201 - 6216 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 640-2243

Business Address:
Suite 11
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7

Business Address:
Suite 201
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L3P 2Y2
Phone Number: (905) 471-6996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITESH MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992