Mehta, Pran Nath (CPSO#: 23156)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:Gauhati University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pran Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 27 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 Oct 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017