Mehta, Rajin (CPSO#: 56838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health
Sciences Centre
Suite L101D
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4076
Fax: (416) 480-4778
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehta Cairns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cairns ( CPSO# 56736 )
Dr. R. Mehta ( CPSO# 56838 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4244

Business Address:
Suite 6
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 485-9155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIN MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1988