Mehta, Sangeeta (CPSO#: 62297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18-216
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4604
Fax: (416) 586-8480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sangeeta Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 62297 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18-216
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANGEETA MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1991