Mehta, Suryakant Dipchand (CPSO#: 28903)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Baroda University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suryakant Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 815 College Street 1st Floor Toronto, ON M6G 1C9 4165331145
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Osama Shabash for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 05 Feb 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2016