Mehta, Tushar (CPSO#: 73840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Memorial Hospital
Emergency Departmet
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Ext. 8505
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton, ON
L6R 3J7
Toronto ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tushar Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mehta ( CPSO# 73840 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUSHAR MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001