Mehta, Viraj (CPSO#: 83012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Building
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47747
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Rd. E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIRAJ MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010