Meikle, Ben Grant (CPSO#: 71476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
920 1st Avenue West
Suite 400
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone: (519) 371-5858
Fax: (519) 371-4853
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Meikle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meikle ( CPSO# 71476 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
920 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone Number: (519) 371-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEN GRANT MEIKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEIKLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002